Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo-Maria Armentano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1766BornMormanno
1 May 179024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 May 182458.0SelectedBishop of Mileto, Italy
12 Jul 182458.2ConfirmedBishop of Mileto, Italy
18 Jul 182458.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
15 Aug 184680.3DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo-Maria Armentano:
Bishop Vincenzo-Maria Armentano O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013