Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Graber

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1903BornBayreuth
1 Aug 192622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Mar 196258.5AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
2 Jun 196258.7Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
14 Sep 198178.0RetiredBishop of Regensburg, Germany
14 Sep 198178.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Regensburg, Germany
17 Sep 198279.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Regensburg, Germany
31 Jan 199288.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Graber:
Bishop Rudolf Graber (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 21 May 2015