Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles John Brown

Apostolic Nuncio to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Aquileia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1959 Born
13 May 198929.5Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
26 Nov 201152.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
26 Nov 201152.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
6 Jan 201252.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
9 Mar 201757.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Albania

MicroData Summary for Charles John Brown
Archbishop Charles John Brown (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Albania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, USA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Albania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,195
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017