Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph von Schork

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1829Born
2 Aug 185424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
26 Aug 189060.7SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
6 Mar 189161.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 May 189161.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
25 Jan 190575.1DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph von Schork (VIAF: 40219063)
Archbishop Joseph von Schork (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKleinheubach, Diocese of Würzburg
Ordained BishopBamberg, Archdiocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 140
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017