Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franco Coppola

Apostolic Nuncio to México

Titular Archbishop of Vinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1957 BornMaglie, Italy
12 Sep 198124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Otranto, Italy
16 Jul 200952.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vinda
16 Jul 200952.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
12 Sep 200952.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Vinda
31 Jan 201456.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
2 Apr 201457.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
9 Jul 201659.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to México

MicroData Summary for Franco Coppola
Archbishop Franco Coppola (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of México

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,274
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Jul 2016