Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand von Schlör

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1839Born
10 Aug 186223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
5 Mar 189859.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
24 Mar 189859.0ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 May 189859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
2 Jun 192485.2DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand von Schlör (VIAF: 5829874)
Bishop Ferdinand von Schlör (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichelbach, Diocese of Würzburg
Ordained BishopWürzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018