Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Sebastian

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1862Born
7 Aug 188724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
28 May 191754.6SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
31 Jul 191754.8ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
23 Sep 191754.9Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
20 May 194380.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Sebastian
Bishop Ludwig Sebastian (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrankenstein

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast