Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Bartolucci

Secretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Titular Archbishop of Mevania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1944 BornBastia Umbra
9 Nov 196824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Assisi, Italy
29 Dec 201066.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
29 Dec 201066.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mevania
5 Feb 201166.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mevania

MicroData Summary for Marcello Bartolucci:
Archbishop Marcello Bartolucci (born ) Secretary of Causes of Saints

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013