Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alberto Cardinal Bovone

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1922BornFrugarolo
26 May 194523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
5 Apr 198461.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Numidia
8 Apr 198461.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
12 May 198461.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Numidia
13 Jun 199573.0AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
21 Feb 199875.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova
21 Feb 199875.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 199875.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
17 Apr 199875.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Alberto Bovone:
Cardinal Alberto Bovone (born , died ) Prefect of Causes of Saints

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013