Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Vincenzo Zani

Secretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Titular Archbishop of Volturnum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1950 BornPralboino
20 Sep 197525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
9 Nov 201262.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
9 Nov 201262.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volturnum
6 Jan 201362.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Volturnum

MicroData Summary for Angelo Vincenzo Zani:
Archbishop Angelo Vincenzo Zani (born ) Secretary of Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,624

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014