Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Guido Filipazzi

Apostolic Nuncio to Nigeria

Titular Archbishop of Sutrium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1963 Born
10 Oct 198724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
8 Jan 201147.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
8 Jan 201147.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sutrium
5 Feb 201147.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sutrium
23 Mar 201147.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia
26 Apr 201753.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guido Filipazzi
Archbishop Antonio Guido Filipazzi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Nigeria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelzo, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Nigeria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,948
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Sep 2017