Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mieczysław Mokrzycki

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1961 Born
17 Sep 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
16 Jul 200746.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
29 Sep 200746.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
21 Oct 200847.5SucceededArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
21 Nov 200847.6InstalledArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mieczysław Mokrzycki
Archbishop Mieczysław Mokrzycki (born ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMajdan Lukawiecki, Poland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lviv.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Dec 2017