Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaello Martinelli

Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1948 BornVilla d’Almé
8 Apr 197223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
2 Jul 200961.0AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
12 Sep 200961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Frascati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaello Martinelli:
Bishop Raffaello Martinelli (born ) Bishop of Frascati

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Frascati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013