Catholic-Hierarchy DC

André-Hercule Cardinal de Fleury

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1653BornLodève
1679²25.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 169845.3SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
18 May 169945.9ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
22 Nov 169946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
3 May 171561.8ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
11 Sep 172673.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jan 174389.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André-Hercule de Fleury:
André-Hercule Cardinal de Fleury (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1726
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015