Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Salgues de Valderies de Lescure

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1644Born
6 Jun 169955.4SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
5 Oct 169955.7ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
8 Nov 169955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
23 May 172379.3DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Salgues de Valderies de Lescure
Bishop Jean-François Salgues de Valderies de Lescure (born , died ) Bishop of Luçon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLescure-d'Albigeois

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast