Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gatien de Galiczon

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Baghdad

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1658BornAngers
8 Jul 170748.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq
8 Jul 170748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
28 Oct 170850.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
27 Sep 171253.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Gatien de Galiczon:
Bishop Gatien de Galiczon (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72, and Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1708, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015