Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Ignace de Foresta Colongue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apt, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1654Born
8 Sep 169541.3SelectedBishop of Apt, France
23 Jan 169641.6ConfirmedBishop of Apt, France
4 Mar 169641.8Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
10 May 172368.9ResignedBishop of Apt, France
18 Dec 173682.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Ignace de Foresta Colongue (VIAF: 20001598)
Bishop Joseph-Ignace de Foresta Colongue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille
Death PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille

  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 9
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast