Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1651Born
167523.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 169543.4SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
30 May 169543.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
10 Jul 169543.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
7 Jan 171563.4DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon (VIAF: 61539997)
Archbishop François de Salignac de La Mothe-Fénelon (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Mondane

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast