Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Soanen, C.O.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1647Born
8 Sep 169548.6SelectedBishop of Senez, France
21 May 169649.3ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
1 Jul 169649.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
21 Sep 172780.7ResignedBishop of Senez, France
25 Dec 174093.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Senez, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Soanen
Bishop Jean Soanen C.O.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Senez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiom

  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast