Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Madot

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1671Born
17 Mar 169624.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 170533.7SelectedBishop of Belley, France
7 Sep 170534.1ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
18 Oct 170534.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
8 Feb 170634.5InstalledBishop of Belley, France
28 Dec 171140.4SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
16 Mar 171240.6ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
Jun 171240.8InstalledBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
7 Oct 175382.2DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for François de Madot
Bishop François de Madot (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuéret

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116, and Page 132
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast