Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anne-François-Guillaume du Cambout-Beçay

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹BornCareil de Guérande
5 Jul 171732.5SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
2 Oct 171934.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
19 Nov 171934.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
8 Jul 172944.5DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anne-François-Guillaume du Cambout-Beçay:
Bishop Anne-François-Guillaume du Cambout-Beçay (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015