Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolò Cardinal Guidi di Bagno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583²Born
25 Jun 164360.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Mar 164461.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
29 Mar 164461.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
5 Dec 165673.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
9 Apr 165774.2Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165774.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
28 May 165875.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
1 Sep 165976.6ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
27 Aug 166380.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Guidi di Bagno (VIAF: 190717160)
Nicolò Cardinal Guidi di Bagno (born 1583, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua
Ordained BishopPius V Chapel, Vatican, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 312, and Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 269
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast