Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marin Labbé, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Titopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648BornLuc-sur-Mer, France
15 Jan 169749.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
12 Sep 170355.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
24 Feb 170456.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
24 Mar 172375.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marin Labbé:
Bishop Charles-Marin Labbé M.E.P. (died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013