Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Hervé Bazan de Flamanville

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1660BornFlamanville-Hague
8 Sep 169535.5SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Dec 169535.8ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Feb 169635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
5 Jan 172160.8DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Hervé Bazan de Flamanville:
Bishop Jean-Hervé Bazan de Flamanville (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015