Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovicus Quémeneur

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
13 Aug 169753.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
12 Jan 169854.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
17 Nov 170460.8DiedTitular Bishop of Sura

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovicus Quémeneur
Bishop Ludovicus Quémeneur (born 1644, died ) Titular Bishop of Sura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrest

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast