Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giulio Lenti

Deceased

Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1824Born
18 Sep 184722.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 186742.1AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
10 Mar 186742.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
28 Jan 187651.1AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
28 Jan 187651.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
6 Sep 188762.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
23 Oct 189570.8DiedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Lenti (VIAF: 89141457)
Patriarch Giulio Lenti (born , died ) Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFrascati, Suburbicarian See of Frascati

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224, and Page 409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 517
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017