Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Pietro de Villanova Castellacci

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1815BornBracciano
Dec 1837³22.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185439.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
17 Dec 185439.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
30 Mar 185540.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
28 Feb 187964.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
17 Sep 188166.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Villanova Castellacci:
Patriarch Pietro de Villanova Castellacci (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014