Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile-Marie Bunoz, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert, British Columbia

Titular Bishop of Tentyris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1864BornSales, France
28 Mar 189127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Mar 190844.0AppointedPrefect of Yukon-Prince Rupert, Canada
13 Jun 191753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tentyris
13 Jun 191753.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert, Canada
18 Oct 191753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tentyris
14 Jan 194479.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert, British Columbia, Canada
3 Jun 194581.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Émile-Marie Bunoz:
Bishop Émile-Marie Bunoz O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Prince Rupert

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013