Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giorgio Cardinal Gusmini

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1855BornGazzaniga
8 Sep 187822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
15 Apr 191054.3AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
16 May 191054.4Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
8 Sep 191458.7AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
6 Dec 191560.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Dec 191560.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
24 Aug 192165.7DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Gusmini:
Cardinal Giorgio Gusmini (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 89
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013