Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Gunn, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1863Born
23 Aug 188421.4ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
2 Feb 189026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
1 Jul 191148.2AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
29 Aug 191148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
19 Feb 192460.9DiedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for John Edward Gunn
Bishop John Edward Gunn S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Natchez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFivemiletown, Ireland

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast