Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Sambucetti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bavaria

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1838Born
30 Mar 188244.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
30 Mar 188244.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
30 Mar 188244.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
1 Apr 188244.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
16 Apr 188244.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
1883¹44.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
1883¹44.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Peru
1883¹44.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
2 Jan 190061.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
15 Oct 190163.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
12 Apr 191173.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bavaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Sambucetti (VIAF: 40551044)
Archbishop Cesare Sambucetti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Bavaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 19
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 58, and Page 69, and Page 111
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 112, and Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Mar 2018