Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Moeller

Deceased

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1849Born
10 Jun 187626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
6 Apr 190050.3AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
25 Aug 190050.7Ordained BishopBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
27 Aug 190050.7InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
27 Apr 190353.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
27 Apr 190353.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Areopolis
31 Oct 190454.8SucceededArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
15 Feb 190555.1InstalledArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
5 Jan 192575.0DiedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Moeller
Archbishop Henry Moeller (born , died ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119, and Page 205
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast