Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Klein

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1819Born
4 Nov 184122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
15 Oct 188667.7AppointedBishop of Limburg, Germany
4 Nov 188667.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
6 Feb 189879.0DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Klein (VIAF: 15514059)
Bishop Karl Klein (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrankfurt
Ordained BishopS. Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017