Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Spina

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1756BornSarzana
13 Nov 179640.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 179842.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
30 Sep 179842.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
23 Feb 180144.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Mar 180246.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Mar 180246.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
24 May 180246.2AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
13 Dec 181660.8ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
21 Feb 182063.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
13 Nov 182872.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Spina:
Cardinal Giuseppe Maria Spina (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
  • a cardinal for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,970
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013