Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles James McDonnell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Pocofeltus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1928Born
29 May 195425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
15 Mar 199465.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
15 Mar 199465.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pocofeltus
12 May 199465.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pocofeltus
21 May 200475.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
13 Feb 202091.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles James McDonnell
Bishop Charles James McDonnell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQueens
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Death PlaceHome for the elderly (Little Sisters of the Poor), Totowa, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Sacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,317
  • d: CB, 18 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast