Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Trenton

Dioecesis Trentonensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 2 August 1881
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Newark
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: New Jersey
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 5,580 (2,156 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: III (NJ, PA)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: TR
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseoftrenton.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 701 Lawrenceville Rd., Trenton, NJ 08648
  • Telephone: (609)406-7400
  • Fax: 406-7412

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
2 August 1881ErectedDiocese of Newark Diocese of Trenton (erected)
9 December 1937Territory LostDiocese of Trenton Diocese of Camden (erected)
19 November 1981Territory LostDiocese of Trenton Diocese of Metuchen (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950293,662900,00032.6%2651273927491231,122156ap1951
1966624,1371,907,27432.7%345924371,4281991,559188ap1967
1970720,7852,162,35533.3%4971346311,1421821,674192ap1971
1976785,6582,356,97433.3%4241105341,47111891,480208ap1977
1980867,2662,602,20633.3%3552055601,548912961,395215ap1981
1990604,2151,698,10035.6%240823221,876153139647124ap1991
1999703,5311,763,24939.9%237633002,34524460509127ap2000
2000712,0001,785,00039.9%235632982,389258123463126ap2001
2001728,3141,979,31436.8%265433082,36426884434127ap2002
2002740,3571,900,37539.0%261433042,435242111427126ap2003
2003761,2471,900,37240.1%257473042,504245109414127ap2004
2004780,9252,000,23539.0%260513112,511326123433127ap2005
2010831,7072,066,16040.3%245683132,657291142376111ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 13 Apr 2013