Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Cohill, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Goroka, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1907Born
20 Mar 193628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
15 Nov 196658.9AppointedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
11 Mar 196759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
30 Aug 198072.7ResignedBishop of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
13 Jun 199486.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Goroka, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for John Edward Cohill
Bishop John Edward Cohill S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Goroka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElizabeth, NJ, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey, USA
Ordained PriestTechny, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained BishopCathedral, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey, USA

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast