Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph O’Hara

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Ath Truim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1946 Born
1 Dec 198438.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201468.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201468.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
4 Aug 201468.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ath Truim

MicroData Summary for John Joseph O’Hara
Bishop John Joseph O’Hara (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City, NJ
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2014
  • ob/c12: CB, 14 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 17 Jun 2014
  • mn: CB, 26 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast