Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Gregory Bootkoski

Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1940 BornNewark
29 May 196625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
7 Jul 199757.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
7 Jul 199757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zarna
5 Sep 199757.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zarna
4 Jan 200261.5AppointedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
19 Mar 200261.7InstalledBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
8 Mar 201675.6RetiredBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Gregory Bootkoski
Bishop Paul Gregory Bootkoski (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Metuchen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,044
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016