Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George William Ahr

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1904BornNewark
29 Jul 192824.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 195045.6AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
20 Mar 195045.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
23 Jun 197975.0RetiredBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
5 May 199388.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for George William Ahr:
Bishop George William Ahr (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trenton

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1950, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013