Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Fitzgerald

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Tamallula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1948 BornMontclair, NJ
17 May 198031.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jun 201062.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jun 201062.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamallula
6 Aug 201062.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamallula

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Fitzgerald:
Bishop Michael Joseph Fitzgerald (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015