Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop of Newark, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1873BornParkers Landing, PA
27 Jan 190026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
10 May 191844.4AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
25 Jul 191844.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
2 Mar 192854.2AppointedBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 May 192854.4InstalledBishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
10 Dec 193764.0AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Apr 193864.4InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
6 Jun 195278.5DiedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Walsh:
Archbishop Thomas Joseph Walsh (born , died ) Archbishop of Newark

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1918, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013