Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Richard G. Lorenzo, O.S.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Tabuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1960 Born
21 Mar 198524.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1988²27.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 198928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Feb 202059.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Feb 202059.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabuda
30 Jun 202059.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabuda

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elias Richard G. Lorenzo
Bishop Elias Richard G. Lorenzo O.S.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained PriestSaint Mary, Abbey, Morristown, Diocese of Paterson, New Jersey
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2020
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 27 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jul 2020

Quantcast