Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Edward Vincent Arliss, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Marbel, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1906Born
15 Aug 192821.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
28 Apr 193427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
18 Nov 196963.1AppointedPrelate of Marbel, Philippines
18 Nov 196963.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
30 Jan 197063.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali
1 Oct 198175.0RetiredPrelate of Marbel, Philippines
1 Oct 198175.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
26 Apr 199689.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Marbel, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Reginald Edward Vincent Arliss
Bishop Reginald Edward Vincent Arliss C.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Marbel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast Orange, NJ, Diocese of Newark, New Jersey, USA
Ordained PriestScranton, PA, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018