Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Arias Pérez, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Badiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1929Born
21 Sep 194718.1EnteredMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
22 Sep 194819.1First VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
22 Sep 195122.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
31 May 195222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
25 Jan 198353.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
25 Jan 198353.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
7 Apr 198353.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae
21 May 200474.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
9 May 201989.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for David Arias Pérez (VIAF: 34542732)
Bishop David Arias Pérez O.A.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMataluenga, Spain
Ordained PriestOlympic Stadium, Montjuic, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Death PlaceHoly Name, Hospital, Teaneck, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Sacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1/prof: CB, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 May 2019

Quantcast