Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Leo Gerety

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1912Born
29 Jun 193926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
4 Mar 196653.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA
4 Mar 196653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
1 Jun 196653.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Crepedula
18 Feb 196754.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Portland, Maine, USA
15 Sep 196957.1SucceededBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
25 Mar 197461.6AppointedArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
28 Jun 197461.9InstalledArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 Jun 198673.8RetiredArchbishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Sep 2016104.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Leo Gerety (VIAF: 14026005)
Archbishop Peter Leo Gerety (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShelton, CT
Ordained PriestNotre Dame, Cathedral, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut

  • a priest for 77.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 Sep 2016
  • opp/c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018