Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Angelo Saltarelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1932BornJersey City
28 May 196028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
2 Jun 199058.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
2 Jun 199058.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
30 Jul 199058.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
21 Nov 199563.8AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
23 Jan 199664.0InstalledBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
7 Jul 200876.4RetiredBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
8 Oct 200977.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelo Saltarelli:
Bishop Michael Angelo Saltarelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2008
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,979
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015