Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Augustine Kearney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Lysinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1902BornJersey City
12 Mar 192724.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 193432.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
22 Dec 193432.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
25 Feb 193532.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia
1 Oct 195654.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond Augustine Kearney:
Bishop Raymond Augustine Kearney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013