Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Arthur (Gerolamo) Pechillo, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey

Titular Bishop of Nova Sparsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1919BornBrooklyn, NY
10 Jun 194728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
10 Sep 196142.3AppointedPrelate of Coronel Oviedo, Paraguay
20 Oct 196546.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa
25 Jan 196646.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa
6 Mar 197656.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
1 Jan 199171.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Arthur (Gerolamo) Pechillo
Bishop Jerome Arthur (Gerolamo) Pechillo T.O.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Sep 2016