Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Massa

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Bardstown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1960 Born
3 Sep 198626.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brooklyn, New York, USA
25 Oct 198626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
19 May 201554.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
19 May 201554.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bardstown
20 Jul 201554.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bardstown

MicroData Summary for James Massa
Bishop James Massa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City, NJ

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 May 2015
  • ob/c12: CB, 19 May 2015
  • od/c0: CB, 17 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast